VA HB1634 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Additional sales and use tax in Halifax County; appropriations to incorporated towns for educational purposes. Authorizes Halifax County to impose an additional local sales and use tax at a rate not to exceed one percent, as determined by the governing body, if initiated by a resolution of the local governing body and approved by the voters at a referendum. The bill requires the governing body to specify in the enacting ordinance the time period, not to exceed 20 years, for which the tax would be imposed. Revenue from the tax shall be used solely for capital projects for new construction or major renovation of schools in Halifax County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax; additional local tax in Halifax County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (9-Y 11-N) (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 648 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1634ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (77-Y 23-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (77-Y 23-N)
2019-02-20HouseReconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 24-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (75-Y 24-N)
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendment (29-Y 11-N)
2019-02-19SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendment (30-Y 10-N)
2019-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-19SenatePending question ordered (26-Y 14-N)
2019-02-19SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-19SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (74-Y 23-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1634H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104414D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104414D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2019-02-01HouseReconsidered by Finance
2019-01-30HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Finance (9-Y 11-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-11-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100979D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581605(n/a)See Bill Text
581605.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581606.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1634
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1634+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1634H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1634ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0648+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1002V0021+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0080+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0082+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2450+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0324+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1634+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0824HB1634+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0825HB1634+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0828HB1634+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0829HB1634+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3163+HB1634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3164+HB1634

Bill Comments

feedback