VA HB1635 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (12-Y 86-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (12-Y 86-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Fossil fuel projects moratorium; clean energy mandates. Establishes a moratorium, effective January 1, 2020, on approval by any state agency or political subdivision of any approval required for (i) electric generating facilities that generate fossil fuel energy through the combustion of a fossil fuel resource; (ii) import or export terminals for fossil fuel resources; (iii) certain maintenance activities relating to an import or export terminal for a fossil fuel resource; (iv) gathering lines or pipelines for the transport of any fossil fuel resource that requires the use of eminent domain on private property; (v) certain maintenance activities relating to such gathering lines or pipelines; (vi) refineries of a fossil fuel resource; and (vii) exploration for any type of fossil fuel, unless preempted by applicable federal law. The measure also requires that at least 80 percent of the electricity sold by a retail electric supplier in calendar years 2028 through 2035 be generated from clean energy resources. In calendar year 2036 and every calendar year thereafter, all of the electricity sold by a retail electric supplier is required to be generated from clean energy resources. The clean energy mandates apply to a public utility or other person that sells not less than 1,000 megawatt hours of electric energy to retail customers or generates not less than 1,000 megawatt hours of electric energy for use by the person. The Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy is authorized to bring actions for injunctions to enforce these requirements. The measure requires the Department to adopt a Climate Action Plan that addresses all aspects of climate change, including mitigation, adaptation, resiliency, and assistance in the transition from current energy sources to clean renewable energy. The measure provides that residents of the Commonwealth and organizations shall have the legal standing to sue to ensure that its provisions and any Climate Action Plan are enforced.
Title
Fossil fuel projects moratorium; clean energy mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (12-Y 86-N) (Y: 12 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (12-Y 86-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Engrossment refused by House (12-Y 86-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Pending question ordered |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Motion to pass by the amendments by Delegate Rasoul agreed to (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Motion to pass by the amendments by Delegate Toscano agreed to (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASS BY (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Motion to pass by the amendment by Delegate Toscano agreed to (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Substitute by Delegate Rasoul offered and no action taken 19105948D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-28 | House | Floor substitute printed 19105948D-H1 (Rasoul) |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (9-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2018-11-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-11-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100460D |