VA HB1636 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Trespass; unmanned aircraft system; prohibited take off or landing; penalty. Provides that any person who knowingly and intentionally causes an unmanned aircraft system to take off or land in violation of current Federal Aviation Administration Special Security Instructions or UAS Security Sensitive Airspace Restrictions is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unmanned aircraft system; trespass, military airfield or military helicopter landing zone, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1636ER)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1636H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104483D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104483D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-11-15HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-11-15HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100556D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182121.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1636
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1636+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1636H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1636ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0612+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0086+HB1636
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0067+HB1636
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2100+HB1636
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0287+HB1636
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1636+HB1636
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0754HB1636+HB1636

Bill Comments

feedback