VA HB1639 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DUI; persons convicted under laws of other states or federal law; restricted license; ignition interlock. Provides that a person convicted in a federal court of an offense substantially similar to Virginia's DUI law may petition the general district court that he be assigned to a certified alcohol safety program and issued a restricted driver's license. Currently, only persons convicted in other states of substantially similar DUI offenses may so petition. The bill also requires that, as a condition of a restricted license, a person who has been convicted of a substantially similar DUI offense under the laws of another state or the United States be prohibited from operating a motor vehicle that is not equipped with an ignition interlock system. This bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
DUI; persons convicted under laws of other states or federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 729 (effective 4/15/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1639ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (94-Y 1-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y1-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1639ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1639H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104840D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Incorporates HB2260 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104840D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101222D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2260 (Similar To) 2015-02-04 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 271.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |