VA HB1640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1640
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Obtaining records concerning electronic communication service or remote computing service; location data. Expands certain disclosure and search warrant requirements for the purposes of obtaining records concerning an electronic communication service or remote computing service from real-time location data to location data, defined in the bill as any data or information concerning the location of an electronic device that, in whole or in part, is generated, derived from, or obtained by the operation of the device. Under current law, such requirements are limited to real-time location data.
Title
Electronic communication service or remote computing service; obtaining records.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104344D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1640 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1640 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1640+hil |