VA HB1641 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; no-excuse absentee. Permits any registered voter to vote by absentee ballot in any election in which he is qualified to vote. The bill removes the current list of statutory reasons under which a person may be entitled to vote by absentee ballot and removes references to those reasons from other sections of the Code.
Title
Absentee voting; no-excuse absentee.
Sponsors
Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-11-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-11-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100922D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |