VA HB165 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teledentistry. Defines "teledentistry," establishes requirements for the practice of teledentistry and the taking of dental scans for use in teledentistry by dental scan technicians, and clarifies requirements related to the use of digital work orders for dental appliances in the practice of teledentistry.
Title
Teledentistry; definitions, establishes requirements for practice, digital scans, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Don Scott [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Kirkland Cox [R] |
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] |
Del. Robert Orrock [R] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Del. Scott Wyatt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 37 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB165ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB165H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106240D-H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106240D-H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101114D |
Same As/Similar To
SB122 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2708.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2708.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2719 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |