VA HB1650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Lottery Law; disclosure of a lottery winner's identity. Prohibits the Virginia Lottery from disclosing information about individual winners whose prize exceeds $10 million, and exempts such information from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), unless the winner consents to disclosure. Under FOIA, disclosure of the winner's name, hometown, and amount won is currently mandatory. This bill is identical to SB 1060.
Title
Lottery; disclosure of identity of winners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1650ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 19106691D-S1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106691D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106691D-S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed House (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1650H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104476D-H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104476D-H1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-11-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101474D |