VA HB1656 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School security officers; employment by private or religious schools; carrying a firearm in performance of duties. Allows private or religious schools to employ a school security officer and to authorize a school security officer to carry a firearm in the performance of his duties, subject to the same criteria for carrying a firearm in the performance of his duties imposed on a school security officer employed by the local school board. The bill also updates the definition of school security officer in the assault and battery statute.
Title
School security officers; employment by private or religious schools, carrying a firearm.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Sen. John McGuire [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 16-N) (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 16-N) (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 120 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1656ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 16-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (78-Y 16-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-11-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100833D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 280.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |