VA HB1659 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse and neglect; mandatory reporters. Adds to the list of persons who are required to report suspected child abuse or neglect ministers, priests, rabbis, imams, and duly accredited practitioners of any religious organization or denomination usually referred to as a church; however, the bill exempts such clergy members from the mandatory reporting requirement when the information supporting the suspicion of child abuse or neglect (i) is required by the doctrine of the religious organization or denomination to be kept confidential or (ii) would be subject to the exemptions set forth in ?§8.01-400 or 19.2-271.3 if offered as evidence in court. This bill is identical to SB 1257.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse and neglect; mandatory reporters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1659ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Peake, Chafin, Boysko
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Delaney, Bell, Robert B., Collins
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-12-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100396D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321509(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1659
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1659+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1659ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0414+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0804V0012+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0086+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0205V0018+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0055+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2347+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0086+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0304+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1659+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1659+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2892+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0782HB1659+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3249+HB1659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1053HB1659+HB1659

Bill Comments

feedback