VA HB1667 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; statute of limitations on actions on construction contracts; statute of limitations on actions on performance bonds. Provides that no action may be brought by a public body on any construction contract, including construction management and design-build contracts, unless such action is brought within five years after substantial completion of the work on the project and that no action may be brought by a public body on a warranty or guarantee in such construction contract more than one year from the breach of that warranty, but in no event more than one year after the expiration of such warranty or guarantee. The bill also limits the time frame during which a public body, other than the Department of Transportation, may bring an action against a surety on a performance bond to within one year after substantial completion of the work on the project. Current law allows a public body, other than the Department of Transportation, to bring such an action within one year after (i) completion of the contract, including the expiration of all warranties and guarantees, or (ii) discovery of the defect or breach of warranty that gave rise to the action.
Title
Va. Public Procurement Act; statute of limitations on actions on construction contracts, bonds, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 6-N) (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106014D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-07 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101460D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4340.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |