VA HB1668 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; Standards of Learning tests. Directs the Board of Education to promulgate regulations to provide the same criteria for eligibility for an expedited retake of any Standards of Learning test to each student regardless of grade level or course.
Title
Public schools; Standards of Learning tests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Education |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102263D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1668 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1668+hil |