VA HB1670 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0928)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0928)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Pharmacy; pharmaceutical processors; cannabis oil. Allows pharmaceutical processors to acquire industrial hemp grown and processed in Virginia from a registered industrial hemp dealer or processor and allows a pharmaceutical processor to process and formulate industrial hemp with cannabis plant extract into an allowable dosage.
Title
Pharmaceutical processors; cannabidiol oil, permit to operate processor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0928) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 928 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1670ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1670H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106381D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106381D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105477D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2519 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2522.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |