VA HB1672 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax credit for paid leave for organ donors. Establishes a tax credit, for taxable years 2019 through 2023, of 35 percent of an employer's expenses in providing paid leave to an employee for the purpose of making an organ donation. The credit is available for expenses related to a leave period of up to 10 days and includes only those expenses incurred paying an employee during his leave period or for the cost of temporary replacement help. Expenses are not eligible for the credit if the employee earns $80,000 or more per year. The credit is nonrefundable but may be carried forward for up to five years.
Title
Income tax, state; tax credit for paid leave for organ donors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100206D |