VA HB1679 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation of all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road motorcycles. Clarifies the taxation of all-terrain vehicles, mopeds, and off-road motorcycles and provides that vehicles that qualify as farm equipment that is exempt from sales and use tax shall be exempt from the motor vehicle sales and use tax. The bill contains technical amendments related to the collection of the additional state sales and use tax within the Historic Triangle.
Title
All-terrain vehicles (ATVs), mopeds, and off-road motorcycles; clarifies taxation on vehicles, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective - see bill) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1679ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1679H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104855D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104855D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100726D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |