VA HB1682 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance networks; dental services. Establishes limits on the ability of a health carrier or third-party administrator to sell or otherwise grant access, as provided in a dentist's or oral surgeon's provider contract, to a third-party carrier. The measure provides that such access may be granted only if it is expressly permitted by the provider contract and notice is given to the affected participating providers. The contracting entity or carrier is required to inform participating providers, upon request, which network plans have been granted access to the contract by the contracting entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental services; contracts between carriers and providers, PPO network arrangement, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 655 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1682ER)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106486D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1682S1
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106486D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106486D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-21HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1682H1
2019-01-18HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104720D-H1
2019-01-18HouseRead second time
2019-01-17HouseRead first time
2019-01-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104720D-H1
2019-01-15HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-12-06HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100316D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.17:1(n/a)See Bill Text
3824509(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1682
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1682+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1682H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1682S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1682ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0655+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0008+HB1682
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1750+HB1682
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0164+HB1682
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1682+HB1682
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1682+HB1682
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2893+HB1682

Bill Comments

feedback