VA HB1683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1683
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Diagnostic medical sonography; certification. Defines the practice of "diagnostic medical sonography" as the use of specialized equipment to direct high-frequency sound waves into an area of the human body to generate an image. The bill provides that only a certified and registered sonographer may hold himself out as qualified to perform diagnostic medical sonography. The bill requires any person who fails to maintain current certification and registration or is subject to revocation or suspension of a certification and registration by a sonography certification organization to notify his employer and cease using ultrasound equipment or performing a diagnostic medical sonography or related procedure.
Title
Diagnostic medical sonography; definition, certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105638D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1683 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1683 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1683+hil |