VA HB1686 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; limitations on fossil fuel facilities. Prohibits the State Corporation Commission (SCC) from issuing on or after July 1, 2019, a certificate of public convenience and necessity or granting any other permit or approval required for the construction or operation by an electric utility of a new fossil fuel facility or for the expansion or continued operation of an existing fossil fuel facility before first approving the construction and placing in service of renewable energy generation facilities having in the aggregate a rated capacity of 5,500 megawatts. The measure also prohibits the SCC on or after July 1, 2019, from authorizing or permitting an electric utility or re-permitting an existing idle fossil fuel facility to increase purchases of electric power under any agreement with another person, if the electric power is or will be generated at a fossil fuel facility, before first approving the construction and placing in service of such renewable energy generation facilities.
Title
Electric utilities; limitations on fossil fuel facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 7-N) (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100059D |