VA HB169 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; occupational disease presumption; correctional officers. Adds correctional officers and full-time sworn members of the enforcement division of the Department of Motor Vehicles to the list of public safety employees who are entitled to a presumption that certain infectious diseases are compensable occupational diseases.
Title
Workers' compensation; occupational disease presumptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1150) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1150 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB169ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108456D-S1 (91-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB169S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108456D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108456D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102696D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB169E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2019-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102696D |