VA HB1690 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0980)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0980)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable gaming; increase in certain maximum allowable prize amounts. Increases the maximum allowable amount for a single bingo door prize from $50 to $250 and the maximum allowable cumulative door prizes in any one bingo session from $250 to $500. The bill also increases the maximum allowable regular bingo or special bingo game prize from $100 to $200 and the prize for a single instant bingo, pull tab, or seal card from $1,000 to $2,000. The bill increases the maximum allowable prize for a bingo jackpot from $1,000 to $2,000 and the total allowable amount of bingo jackpot prizes awarded in any one session from $1,000 to $2,000. The bill also increases from $100 to $200 the allowable amount of increase of a progressive prize per session in certain progressive bingo games. The bill directs the Charitable Gaming Board to convene a stakeholder work group to review the current limitations on prize amounts and provide any recommendations to the General Assembly by November 30, 2020. The provisions of the bill do not become effective unless reenacted by the 2021 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Charitable gaming; increase in certain maximum allowable prize amounts.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 3-N) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 3-N) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0980) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 980 (effective - see bill) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1690ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (32-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104802D |