VA HB1703 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Telework expenses tax credit; expiration. Reinstates the telework expenses tax credit for taxable years 2020 and 2021. Under current law, the tax credit expired for taxable years on or after January 1, 2019. The bill removes the application process for claiming the credit and directs the Tax Commissioner to develop and update procedures and guidelines for claiming the credit at the time eligible employers file their taxes for the previous taxable year.
Title
Telework expenses; reinstates tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104372D |