VA HB1704 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; financial aid award notification. Requires any comprehensive financial aid award notification provided to a student by a public institution of higher education or private institution of higher education to meet the requirements and best practices established by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia in its Financial Aid Award Letters Policies and Guidance. This bill is identical to SB 1593.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions; financial aid award notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1704ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Peake, Howell
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Reid, Landes, Robinson
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19104754D-EH1
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1704EH1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment from Appropriations agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Education agreed to 19104754D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104754D-H1
2019-01-21HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-12-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100317D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231411(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1704
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1704+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1704H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1704EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1704ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0571+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0903V0003+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0022+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0206V0006+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0036+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2303+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0236+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1704+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB1704+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3042+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0845HB1704+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3275+HB1704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1011HB1704+HB1704

Bill Comments

feedback