VA HB1706 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; PTSD. Declares that post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) suffered by a first responder is an occupational disease suffered in the line of duty if, among other conditions, the PTSD is demonstrated by clear and convincing evidence to have resulted from the responder's documented exposure to a qualifying event in the course of his employment. Qualifying events include seeing a deceased minor, directly witnessing the death of a minor, and seeing a decedent whose death involved grievous bodily harm of a nature that shocks the conscience. The measure also requires employers of first responders to provide educational training related to PTSD awareness, prevention, mitigation, and treatment.
Title
Workers' compensation; declares PTSD suffered by a first responder as an occupational disease, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101213D |