VA HB1707 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; notice penalty for fraud. Requires the Virginia Employment Commission to provide claimants with notices of the sanctions to which a claimant is subject as a consequence of providing false or misleading statements to obtain state unemployment compensation benefits. The failure of the claimant to receive a notice shall not constitute a defense to any criminal prosecution, administrative fraud disqualification, or action to collect an overpayment of benefits.
Title
Unemployment compensation; notices of penalties for fraudulent claims for benefits, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Daniel Marshall [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] |
Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Sen. Chris Head [R] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] | Del. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 740 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1707ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-19 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1707ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103130D-E |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1707E |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: #2 |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103130D |