VA HB1710 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting. Provides that the parent or legal custodian of a child four years of age or younger and who is caring for such child in the home shall be entitled to vote absentee.
Title
Absentee voting; parent or legal custodian of child four years of age or younger.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100954D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1710 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1710+hil |