VA HB1710 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services Trust Fund; use of funds. Provides that proceeds from the sale of vacant buildings and land resulting from the closure or downsizing of any training centers that are deposited in the Behavioral Health and Developmental Services Trust Fund shall be used only for the purpose of creating additional waiver slots and reducing waiting lists for services through the Intellectual Disability Medicaid Waiver and the Individual and Family Developmental Disabilities Support Medicaid Waiver.
Title
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services Trust Fund; use of funds.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104401D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102722D |