VA HB1710 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public school buses; seat belts. Requires the Board of Education to make regulations to require each new public school bus purchased for the transportation of students to be equipped with a seat belt consisting of a lap belt and shoulder strap or harness in every seat. The bill requires each school board to ensure that no later than July 1, 2037, each school bus that it uses for the transportation of students is equipped with a seat belt in every seat.
Title
Public school buses; seat belts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100952D |