VA HB1719 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0929)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0929)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commissioner of Social Services; work group; plan for licensure of prescribed pediatric extended care centers in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Commissioner of Social Services to establish a work group to develop a plan for the licensure of prescribed pediatric extended care centers in the Commonwealth. The work group shall report the plan to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by November 1, 2020.
Title
Prescribed pediatric extended care centers; plan for licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0929) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 929 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1719ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105454D-E |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1719E |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105454D |