VA HB1721 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Board for Community Colleges; reduced rate tuition and mandatory fee charges; certain students who are active duty members of the Armed Forces of the United States. Permits the State Board for Community Colleges to charge reduced rate tuition and mandatory fees to any student who is (i) an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed outside of the Commonwealth; (ii) enrolled in a degree program at a comprehensive community college, provided that any such comprehensive community college that offers online degree programs is a member of the National Council for State Authorization Reciprocity; and (iii) enrolled in training that leads to a Military Occupational Specialty in the Army or Marine Corps, an Air Force Specialty Code, or a Navy Enlisted Classification.
Title
Community Colleges, State Board for; reduced rate tuition and mandatory fee charges.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] |
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. David Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1721ER2) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2017-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1721ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103466D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1721E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2017-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103466D |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Community Colleges
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Tuition
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Community Colleges
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Tuition