VA HB1723 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Presiding officer of county board of supervisors; terminology. Specifies that the presiding officer of a board of supervisors shall be called "chairman," "chairwoman," "chair," or "chair-at-large," in the presiding officer's discretion.
Title
County board of supervisors; presiding officers, terminology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100557D |