VA HB1725 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Delivery of completed absentee ballot applications by third parties. Provides that no person, with certain exceptions, shall offer to mail or deliver 25 or more completed absentee ballot applications on behalf of voters for any election.
Title
Absentee ballots; no individual, etc., shall mail 25 or more completed applications for voters.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 11-N) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Senate | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 11-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 11-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1725H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104580D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104580D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101841D |