VA HB1726 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Distribution of mail voter registration application forms; certain public and private institutions of higher education. Requires the Department of Elections to provide a reasonable number of mail voter registration application forms to public institutions of higher education, nonprofit private institutions of higher education that are eligible to participate in the Tuition Assistance Grant Program, and any other education institution that is authorized to issue bonds. The bill requires the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to assist the Department by providing a list of such institutions and by requesting those institutions to make the mail voter registration application forms available to students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mail voter registration application forms; distribution to certain public and private institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-12HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-18HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 19101299D
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-12-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101299D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242416.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback