VA HB1729 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School counselors; nomenclature; staff time. Changes the name of guidance counselors to school counselors and requires each school counselor employed by a school board in a public elementary or secondary school to spend at least 80 percent of his staff time during normal school hours in the direct counseling of individual students or groups of students.
Title
Guidance counselors; changes name to school counselors, staff time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139) | |
2019-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 139 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1729ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1729H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104768D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104768D-H1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100598D |