VA HB1732 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-16)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-16)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School safety procedures; emergency situations; annual training. Requires each school board to develop training on safety procedures in the event of an emergency situation on school property. The bill requires such training to be delivered to each student and employee in each school at least once each school year. This bill is identical to SB 1215.
Title
School safety procedures; emergency situations, annual training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140) | |
2019-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 140 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1732ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1732H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104872D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104872D-H1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100605D |