VA HB1735 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Commission on Student Behavioral Health created. Establishes the Commission on Student Behavioral Health as a legislative branch commission. The purpose of the Commission shall be to (i) assess the efficacy of developing and implementing a statewide behavioral health and suicide prevention hotline that students may use to report threats of violence or receive real-time counseling services; (ii) review the current school counselor-to-student ratio, and whether the realignment of counseling responsibilities proposed by the House Select Committee on School Safety is improving schools' ability to provide counseling services to students; (iii) review the current roles and responsibilities of school nurses, psychologists, and social workers in schools and determine whether a realignment of responsibilities could improve or streamline behavioral health services offered to students; (iv) evaluate the efficacy and costs of providing enhanced behavioral health services in schools delivered through partnerships established between school divisions and local departments of social services and community services boards; (v) assess the effectiveness of de-escalation and other alternative disciplinary policies when interacting with students suffering from behavioral health challenges; (vi) examine the value of additional teacher training requirements on student behavioral health, such as mental health first aid; and (vii) examine other topics related to student behavioral health identified by the Commission. The Commission shall consist of 12 members as follows: seven members of the House of Delegates, of whom two shall be members of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions, two shall be members of the House Committee on Education, two shall be members of the House Committee on Appropriations, and one shall be a member at-large, to be appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates; and five members of the Senate, of whom two shall be members of the Senate Committee on Education and Health, two shall be members of the Senate Committee on Finance, and one shall be a member at-large, to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. The Commission may appoint, employ, and remove an executive director and such other persons as it deems necessary and determine their duties and fix their salaries or compensation within the amounts appropriated therefor. The Commission may also employ experts who have special knowledge of the issues before it. All agencies of the Commonwealth shall provide assistance to the Commission, upon request. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Behavioral Health, Commission on; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) (Y: 1 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseFailed to pass in House
2019-02-24HouseNo further action taken
2019-02-21SenateSenators: McDougle, Newman, Saslaw
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Robinson, Jones, S.C., O'Quinn, Torian
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules with amendments (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19101085D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1735E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 1-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-19HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-12-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101085D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1735
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1735+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1735E+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H2001V0014+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H20V0027+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2453+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S10V0051+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0389+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB1735+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB1735+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3201+HB1735
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0979HB1735+HB1735

Bill Comments

feedback