VA HB1738 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School buildings; plans to be reviewed by an individual or entity experienced in crime prevention through environmental design. Requires the plans and specifications for new or remodeled public school building construction to be reviewed by an individual or entity with professional expertise in crime prevention through environmental design. All comments by such reviewer shall be submitted to the Superintendent of Public Instruction along with the final plans and specifications.
Title
School buildings; plans to be reviewed by a professional trained & experienced in crime prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 226 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1738ER) |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106566D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1738S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106566D-S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106566D-S1 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100653D |