VA HB1755 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Broadband services; prohibited features. Prohibits a provider of broadband services from offering or renewing services to consumers within any locality in the Commonwealth in which certain media is throttled, blocked, or prioritized on the basis of its content, format, host address, or source.
Title
Broadband services; prohibited features.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100226D |