VA HB1759 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance holding companies; internationally active insurance groups. Authorizes a designated state to act as a group-wide supervisor for an internationally active insurance group (IAIG). An IAIG is an insurance holding company group that has premiums written in at least three countries, has at least 10 percent of premiums written in foreign countries, and has total assets greater than $50 billion or total premiums greater than $10 billion. The measure enacts provisions of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' revisions to the Model Insurance Holding Company System Regulatory Act.
Title
Insurance holding companies; supervision of internationally active insurance groups.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 692 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1759ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-14 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102997D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1332.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1333 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |