VA HB1761 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State correctional facilities; prohibition on procurement by public bodies of articles produced or manufactured and services provided by persons confined in state correctional facilities. Prohibits articles produced or manufactured and services provided by persons confined in state correctional facilities from being purchased by (i) any department, institution, or agency of the Commonwealth that is supported in whole or in part with funds from the state treasury or (ii) any county, district of any county, city, or town or by any nonprofit organization, including volunteer emergency medical services agencies, fire departments, sheltered workshops, and community service organizations. Under current law, state departments, institutions, and agencies that are supported in whole or in part with funds from the state treasury are required to purchase such articles and services, and counties, districts of any county, cities, and towns, as well as any nonprofit organizations, are permitted to purchase such articles and services. The bill provides that such articles and services may be disposed of by the Director of the Department of Corrections only by sale or exchange on the open market. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
State correctional facilities; procurement by public bodies of articles produced or manufactured.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100750D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 614.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 45 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 45.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 47 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 53 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 54 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 132.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |