VA HB1765 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers. Allows a retired law-enforcement officer to continue to receive his service retirement allowance during a subsequent period of employment by a local school division as a school security officer.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2018-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101740D |