VA HB1766 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Newport News; inaugural meeting of newly elected council. Authorizes the Newport News City Council to set the time of the inaugural meeting of the newly elected council that is held on the first regular meeting date in July after council elections. Current law requires that the meeting be held at 10:00 a.m. This bill incorporates HB 1995 and is identical to SB 1045.
Title
Newport News, City of; amending charter, inaugural meeting of newly elected council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1766ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1766H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105002D-H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Incorporates HB1995 (Price) |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105002D-H1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-12-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101199D |