VA HB1769 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Management of menhaden. Requires the Virginia Marine Resources Commission (the Commission) to adopt regulations to implement the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission's Fishery Management Plan for Atlantic Menhaden and authorizes the Commission to adopt regulations for managing the Commonwealth's menhaden fishery. The bill also requires that any moratorium on the fishery be subject to legislative review. The bill repeals several Code sections relating to quotas, allocation of allowable landings, and administrative procedures that will be included in a regulatory framework for managing the fishery.
Title
Menhaden; VMRC to adopt regulations for managing the Commonwealth's fishery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101401D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1000.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |