VA HB1773 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Veterans Affairs and Homeland Security. Establishes the Office of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs and Homeland Security with responsibility to the Governor for veterans services and homeland preparedness and security. The state entities reporting through the new Secretary's Office are the Department of Veterans Services, Secure Commonwealth Panel, Veterans Services Foundation, Virginia Military Advisory Council, and Virginia War Memorial Foundation. The bill also makes technical changes and is identical to
Title
Veterans Affairs and Homeland Security, Secretary of; establishes position.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 780 (effective 4/6/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1773ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1773ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-02 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1773H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104572D-H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104572D-H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103554D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1263 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0858)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 7302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 232 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2666.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2666.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2666.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2732 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2733 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 344.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 1200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |