VA HB1774 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pawning goods; unexpired government-issued identification card required. Requires the government-issued identification card presented by a person pawning, pledging, or selling goods or selling precious metals or gems to be unexpired and to bear the person's current legal address. If the government-issued identification card does not bear the current legal address, the bill requires the pawner or seller to present other documentation to verify his current legal address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pawning goods; unexpired government-issued identification card required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 457 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1774ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 1-N)
2019-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-26HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101623D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5414009(n/a)See Bill Text
5414101(n/a)See Bill Text
5414102(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1774
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1774+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1774ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0457+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0007+HB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0040+HB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1801+HB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0145+HB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1774+HB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1774+HB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2895+HB1774

Bill Comments

feedback