VA HB1775 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Protective services for adults by local departments of social services; multidisciplinary teams. Allows local departments of social services to foster, when practicable, the creation, maintenance, and coordination of hospital and community-based multidisciplinary teams to assist the local departments in identifying abused and exploited adults. The bill also provides that such multidisciplinary teams may develop agreements regarding the exchange of information among the parties for the purposes of the investigation and disposition of complaints of adult abuse and exploitation, delivery of services, and protection for abused or exploited adults. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Protective services for adults; multidisciplinary teams to assist local depts. of social services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101624D |