VA HB1777 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local regulation of parking of certain vehicles. Adds Cape Charles to the towns that are permitted to regulate or prohibit the parking on any public highway of watercraft, boat trailers, motor homes, and camping trailers and to regulate or prohibit the parking of commercial vehicles on any public highway in a residence district. This bill is identical to SB 1560.
Title
Parking of certain vehicles; regulation in the Town of Cape Charles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144) | |
2019-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 144 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1777ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102430D |