VA HB1778 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 78-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 78-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; state parks. Permits localities to impose transient occupancy taxes on transient room rentals and travel campgrounds in state parks.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; taxes on room rentals, etc., in state parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 78-N) (Y: 19 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 78-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (19-Y 78-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-17 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101537D-E |
2019-01-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1778E |
2019-01-17 | House | Amendment by Delegate Bloxom agreed to |
2019-01-17 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N) |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101537D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3819.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |