VA HB1780 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Salvage vehicles. Removes the requirement that a vehicle be late model in order to meet the definition of salvage vehicle due to having been (i) acquired by an insurance company as part of the claims process or (ii) damaged to the extent that its estimated cost of repair would exceed its value before the damage minus the salvage value. The bill expands corresponding reporting requirements to require application for a salvage certificate for certain early model vehicles. The bill also removes the requirement that a vehicle be late model in order to meet the definition of rebuilt vehicle.
Title
Salvage vehicles; removes requirement that a vehicle be late model.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102017D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1602.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |