VA HB1781 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicle safety inspections; maximum charges. Increases from $12 to $15 the maximum amount a safety inspection station can charge for an inspection of a motorcycle and increases from $16 to $25 the maximum amount a safety inspection station can charge for an inspection of a vehicle other than a motorcycle, autocycle, tractor truck, truck that has a gross vehicle weight rating of 26,000 pounds or more, or motor vehicle that is used to transport passengers and has a seating capacity of more than 15 passengers, including the driver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle safety inspections; maximum charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Transportation
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-26HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-12-26HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101489D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621167(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback