VA HB1787 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Student offenses reportable by intake officers to school division superintendents. Adds (i) threats of death or bodily injury to another person communicated in writing to such person or member of such person's family and (ii) threats to commit serious bodily harm to persons on school property to the list of offenses that a juvenile intake officer is required to report to the school division superintendent when a petition is filed alleging that a juvenile student committed such an offense. This bill is identical to SB 1381.
Title
Students; offenses reportable by juvenile intake officers to school division superintendents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 106 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1787ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101060D-E |
2019-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1787E |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101060D |